skip to content

Ram, John Raymond

CPSO#: 89054

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Pickering FHO
1101 Kingston Road
Suite 220
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 831-9797 Ext. Ext 5
Fax: (905) 839-9984 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Ram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ram ( CPSO# 89054 )

Business Address:
Suite 220
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 831-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN RAYMOND RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010