skip to content

Ram, Ganesh Harirama

CPSO#: 86064

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 110, 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M5E2
Canada
Phone: 5196219257
Fax: 5192088182
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

13158 Tecumseh Road East, Suite 4
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 948-0766
Fax: (519) 948-2681
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ganesh Ram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ram ( CPSO# 86064 )

Business Address:
3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
270 Riddell Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 6N6
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GANESH HARIRAMA RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007