skip to content

Ralhan, Vikram

CPSO#: 85712

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V. Ralhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ralhan ( CPSO# 85712 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKRAM RALHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2008