skip to content

Rajkotwala, Victor Abdulhusein

CPSO#: 84844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Wise Elephant FHT
2 Kennedy Road South, Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Canada
Phone: (289) 323-0660
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

IHealth Centre
6175 Hwy#7, Unit 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 4168408434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor Rajkotwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rajkotwala ( CPSO# 84844 )

Business Address:
Vaughan Diagnostic Medical Centre
Suites 19 and 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR ABDULHUSEIN RAJKOTWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJKOTWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008