skip to content

Rajji, Tarek H

CPSO#: 85792

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1307 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek K. Rajji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajji ( CPSO# 85792 )

Business Address:
Room 6312
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAREK H RAJJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2008