skip to content

Rajesan, Ratheishan

CPSO#: 89449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Academic
Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone: (416) 264-4446
Fax: (416) 264-4456 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ratheishan Rajesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rajesan ( CPSO# 89449 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Academic
Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 264-4446

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RATHEISHAN RAJESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJESAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010