skip to content

Rajan, Tasleem Anar

CPSO#: 94925

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
EL - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015