skip to content

Rajamanickam, Sendhan Amudhan

CPSO#: 85507

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 02 Nov 2006
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 03 Nov 2006 to 16 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Aug 2007 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Aug 2008 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017