skip to content

Raizman, Alla

CPSO#: 97157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: 905-378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alla Raizman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raizman ( CPSO# 97157 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active
             Dr. Alla Raizman may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.