skip to content

Rai, Sherapartap Singh

CPSO#: 87407

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caledon Medical Clinc
Unit 2, 12560 Kennedy Road
Caledon ON  L7C 4C4
Phone: (905) 843-0071
Fax: (905) 843-0005 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Walk-in, Superstore Lansdown Place
769 Borden ave
(Available as need arises).
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B6
Canada
Phone: (705) 775-1516
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:  

131 Talbot Street West
Leamington, ON
N8H 1N2
Date Received: 14 Jul 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 10 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Jun 2011 Active
 (1 of 2)

Effective May 27, 2022, Dr. Rai has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

(2 of 2)

            As from June 24, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh
            Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
                  privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
                  preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from
                  time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Drug/Substance                                   Relinquished      
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                                         X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)              X


Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2016
Summary:

On January 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

During the relevant time period, Dr. Rai practised in an emergency room at the only hospital in a small town. He was also engaged in a sexual relationship with the woman in issue, Ms. A, throughout that period. It was undisputed that Dr. Rai assessed, diagnosed and treated Ms. A on one occasion in a clinic and on nine occasions at the hospital ER over a number of years. The Discipline Committee determined that the medical treatments did not give rise to a physician- patient relationship, however. It noted that there was no evidence that Dr. Rai provided regular care to Ms. A and that there was no evidence the ER visits were arranged ahead of time, or that there was another physician available in the ER to see her when she visited. All of the treatment occasions constituted “incidental care.” In particular, the Committee held that “given the context of the small town ER, Dr. Rai had no choice but to attend to [her] medical needs and to provide care for her problems,” finding that the ER visits were “incidental care to a spouse, given the nature of the visits and the unique set of circumstances in this case.” The clinic treatment was ill-advised, but it did not create a doctor-patient relationship.

Dr. Rai was found to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to treating Ms. A at a clinic visit at which he performed a Pap test and ordered blood work, by treating a family member in a non-emergency situation.

PENALTY

On May 6, 2016, the Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration for period of two (2) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 7, 2016.

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration:
 
Dr. Rai shall participate in and successfully complete the next available course on “Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship” offered by Western University, or an equivalent program acceptable to the College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of completion thereof to the College.

COSTS

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00, within one hundred and twenty (120) days of the date upon which the suspension of his certificate of registration is lifted.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 27-31, 2015