skip to content

Rai, Sharadindu

CPSO#: 84749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Mar 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hyde Park Medical & Walk-In Clinic
4-640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone: (519) 641-3627
Fax: (519) 641-3628 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bhalla Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhalla ( CPSO# 82403 )
Dr. S. Rai ( CPSO# 84749 )

Business Address:
4 - 640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone Number: (519) 641-3627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 22 Mar 2019 Active
 

            As from March 22, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sharadindu Rai in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                          DR. SHARADINDU RAI
                                              ("Dr. Rai")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rai, certificate of registration number 84749, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that following receipt of a public complaint that
                  raised concerns about my family medicine practice, the College conducted
                  an investigation bearing File Number 1100785 (the "Investigation").  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for a minimum
                        period of twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for the first three
                              (3) months. The first meeting must take place in person. The
                              remaining meetings may take place via secure
                              videoconferencing technology approved by the College. After a
                              minimum of three (3) months of supervision, if my Clinical
                              Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in
                              the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet
                              with me once every three (3) months for an additional nine
                              (9) months. 
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within thirty (30)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor the CPSO
                              Policy: 
                              Medical Records; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment shall include a chart review of
                        a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, and may include direct
                        observation of my care, an interview with me, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and
                        review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location in which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12   )I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains 
                        in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted following a public
                              complaint about Dr. Rai's family medicine practice. As a
                              result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Rai will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Rai will engage in professional education in medical
                              record-keeping.
                  
                              Dr. Rai's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                              by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of
                              Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rai, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College 
                        determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Rai, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: March 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sharadindu Rai to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 22, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint about Dr. Rai’s family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Rai will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Rai will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.

Dr. Rai’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Update as of November 2, 2018: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Update as of November 2, 2018: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)