skip to content

Rai, Nanky

CPSO#: 106702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
168 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: 416-703-8482
Fax: 416-703-8479 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Aug 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NANKY RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017