skip to content

Rai, Bikramjit Singh

CPSO#: 98022

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone: (519) 369-2510
Fax: (519) 369-3831 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rai ( CPSO# 98022 )

Business Address:
368 College Street North
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BIKRAMJIT SINGH RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014