Rai, Amendeep Singh (CPSO#: 99641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Nov 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 645-2444 Ext. 3
Fax: (519) 645-2545
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1051 wonderland road south
London ON  N6K3X4
Canada
Phone: 519-645-2444 Ext. 5
Fax: 519-645-2545
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Rai & S. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018


Corporation Name: A. Rai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai ( CPSO# 99641 )

Business Address:
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 645-2444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Amendeep Singh Rai may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.