skip to content

Rahman, Syed Tanzilur

CPSO#: 90631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.T. Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman ( CPSO# 90631 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Brampton ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED TANZILUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Nov 2010 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014