skip to content

Rahman, Shafiur

CPSO#: 92205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1135 Adelaide St N
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone: (519) 438-4500
Fax: (519) 438-4504 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rubaiyyat & Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rubaiyyat ( CPSO# 81377 )
Dr. S. Rahman ( CPSO# 92205 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Family Medical Centre
PO Box 5777
STN B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Business Address:
Highbury Medical Clinic Inc
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
1135 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone Number: (519) 438-4500

Business Address:
1228 Commissioners Rd W
Byron Family Medical Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON  N6K 1C7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Jan 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018 Active
             Dr. Shafiur Rahman may practise medicine independently in family medicine.