skip to content

Rahman, Muhammad Zia-Ur

CPSO#: 85317

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Oct 2008
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 28 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009