skip to content

Rahman, K M Anisur

CPSO#: 89188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
195 Henry Street
Unit 5
Brantford ON  N3S 5C9
Phone: 5197529999 Ext. 207 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Willett Urgent care
238 grand river street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

1357 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON  M1J 1G7
Canada
Phone: (647) 352-2274
Fax: 6473522297
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K M Anisur Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rahman ( CPSO# 89188 )

Business Address:
1357 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1G7

Business Address:
195 Henry Street
Unit 5
Brantford ON  N3S 5C9
Phone Number: 5197529999

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M2
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
204 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. K M ANISUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012