skip to content

Rahimi, Abdulwali Samad

CPSO#: 94422

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Hindi, Pashto, Urdu

Education:Marathwada University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Family Health Organization
Haldimand FHT Clinic
75 Parkview Road Suite 4
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: (289) 524-0053
Fax: (289) 283-3029 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Haldimand General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: 289-523-0053
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abdulwali Samad Rahimi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahimi ( CPSO# 94422 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
75 Parkview Lane
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (289) 524-0053


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active
 Dr.  Abdulwali  Samad  Rahimi  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine.