skip to content

Rahil, Preetinder Singh

CPSO#: 84812

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 780-0375
Fax: (519) 780-0080 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rahil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghuman ( CPSO# 93525 )
Dr. P. Rahil ( CPSO# 84812 )

Business Address:
University of Waterloo Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone Number: (519) 888-4990

Business Address:
Student Wellness Centre
Wilfred Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710

Business Address:
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 780-0375

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
850 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PREETINDER SINGH RAHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008