skip to content

Raheel, Erum

CPSO#: 85484

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 Tuxedo court
Scarborough ON  M1G 3S7
Phone: (416) 439-0163
Fax: (416) 439-7609 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 100
1501 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1P 4T6
Canada
Phone: 416-439-0163
Fax: (416) 439-7609
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erum Raheel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raheel ( CPSO# 85484 )

Business Address:
100 - 1501 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4T6
Phone Number: (416) 439-0163


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERUM RAHEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHEEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007