skip to content

Rahalkar, Amit Ramesh

CPSO#: 93016

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Vidal Street North
Suite #2
Sarnia, Ontario
N7T 5X5
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone: 519-332-5959
Fax: 519-337-0975 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Rahalkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahalkar ( CPSO# 93016 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
Suite 2
120 Vidal Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone Number: (519) 332-5959

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIT RAMESH RAHALKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHALKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018