skip to content

Rahal, Sherine

CPSO#: 93160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of London, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovaird Dr E
Charm Fertility & Gynecology
Unit 517
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 457-8558 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:19 Mar 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERINE RAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2020