Ragunathan, Subhani Dhanushka (CPSO#: 98083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321 Ext. 322
Fax: (905) 655-4848
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ragunathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ragunathan ( CPSO# 98083 )

Business Address:
5959 Andereson Street
Suite 1A
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBHANI DHANUSHKA RAGUNATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGUNATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014