skip to content

Raghuram, Kamini

CPSO#: 98119

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Kilgour Road
Developmental Paediatrics
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220 Ext. 3390 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAMINI RAGHURAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHURAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Feb 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 06 Aug 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016