skip to content

Ragheb, Mariam

CPSO#: 98808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: Guirguis, Mariam (used until: 15 Dec 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6P 1A1
Phone: (905) 554-6491
Fax: (905) 554-6492 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mariam Ragheb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ragheb ( CPSO# 98808 )

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
377 Church Street
Suite 205
Markham ON  L6P 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 554-6491

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIAM RAGHEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2014