skip to content

Ragaz, Stephan Curdin

CPSO#: 32473

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Bern, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephan Ragaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Turnbull Medical Building 203 - 170 Simcoe St Peterborough, ON K9H 2H7
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the above address.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019