skip to content

Rafiq, Arif

CPSO#: 100056

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIF RAFIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2019