skip to content

Radziuk, Jerzy Mikolaj

CPSO#: 32160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 316 Daly Avenue Ottawa ON K1N 6G7
Date Received: 31 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017