skip to content

Radwi, Ghazala Rashid Haider Karamat

CPSO#: 85401

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 24 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2011 to 29 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012