skip to content

Radovanovic, Ivan

CPSO#: 89712

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Serbian

Education:University of Geneva, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
University of Toronto
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6207
Fax: (416) 603-5298 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Radovanovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Radovanovic ( CPSO# 89712 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
4th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:23 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Ivan Radovanovic may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Neurosurgery,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr.
                        Radovanovic holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Radovanovic no longer holds the 
                  appointment, referred to in clause 1.