skip to content

Rabzel, Martina

CPSO#: 30514

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 05 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2021