skip to content

Raby, Laurent Paul

CPSO#: 41213

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Feb 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Feb 2005