skip to content

Rabinovitch, Hyman Ephraim

CPSO#: 27293

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
22 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hyman Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 31, 2020
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 5, 2020, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c ) of the Public Hospital Act and s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on April 28, 2020, Dr. Hyman Rabinovitch had provided written notice of his retirement from all clinical activities at the Ottawa Hospital as of August 31, 2020.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:06 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hyman Ephraim Rabinovitch to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2020:

A College investigation was initiated into whether Dr. Rabinovitch engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his neurology practice. During the investigation, Dr. Rabinovitch resigned from the College effective January 22, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.