skip to content

Rabea, Ahmed Magdy Adly Mohamed

CPSO#: 92374

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 22 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2010