skip to content

Ra, Greta Sang-Myung

CPSO#: 89254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 204B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4545
Fax: (905) 853-4501 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Greta Ra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ra ( CPSO# 89254 )

Business Address:
204B - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRETA SANG-MYUNG RA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013