skip to content

Tang, Ryan Christopher

CPSO#: 91142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Russell St
Telemental Health
Suite 1071
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 34778 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Canada
Phone: 6474789865
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434 Ext. 4600
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan C. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tang ( CPSO# 91142 )

Business Address:
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone Number: (647) 478-9865

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Telepsychiatry Services
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN CHRISTOPHER TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014