skip to content

Sorensen, Ronald Bjorndahl

CPSO#: 30034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Nov 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor ON  N8W 5B3
Phone: (519) 974-8879
Fax: (519) 974-9261 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. B. Sorensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sorensen ( CPSO# 30034 )

Business Address:
3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor ON  N8W 5B3
Phone Number: (519) 974-8879

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 253-4559

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 11, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notice from Windsor Regional Hospital of a temporary suspension of privileges held by Dr. Ronald B. Sorensen, effective January 11. 2010. On November 8, 2010, Dr. Sorensen's privileges were restored with restrictions.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 10 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Oct 2018 Active
             As from October 24, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ronald Bjorndahl
            Sorensen, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sorensen
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RONALD BJORNDAHL SORENSEN
                                          ("Dr. Sorensen")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sorensen, certificate of registration number 30034, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215506 into whether I engaged in professional
                  misconduct and/or am incompetent in my urology practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A," and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Pre-operatively review with me any cases in which I propose
                              to perform GreenLight Laser Prostatectomy, in order to
                              determine whether the procedure is in the Clinical
                              Supervisor's view warranted and, if so, provide approval to
                              me to proceed with the approved procedure, which approval
                              shall be noted in the patient chart and in the Log (define
                              below); 
                  
                        (ii)  Observe me in the course of all GreenLight Laser
                              Prostatectomies which I perform; 
                  
                        (iii) Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (iv)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (v)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) months;
                  
                        (vi)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (vii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews,
                              observations, and pre-operative reviews;
                  
                        (viii)Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (ix)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (x)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every two
                              (2) months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the medical
                        inspector received on September 15, 2017, October 13, 2017, and
                        November 23, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I sign this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including review and preparation of a two to four
                        (2-4) page or approximately two thousand (2000) word summary of the
                        College's policies on consent and medical records, with reference
                        to current standards of practice, how they apply to my situation,
                        and how I have made or plan to make changes to my practice. I
                        undertake to submit these to the College within three months of the
                        date on which I sign this Undertaking
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake that during the course of Clinical
                        Supervision, I will maintain a log of GreenLight Laser
                        Prostatectomies (the "Log"), indicating the date and time when
                        approval was received or denied from my Clinical Supervisor to
                        perform the procedure, the date of the procedure if performed, and
                        patient identifying information.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sorensen, undertake to provide a copy of the Log to the
                        College once every two (2) months during the course of Clinical
                        Supervision, and to maintain the original Log for inspection by the
                        College and review by the Clinical Supervisor. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the
                        practice of urology. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months. 
                  
                              During Clinical Supervision, Dr. Sorensen will
                              pre-operatively review any cases where he proposes to perform
                              GreenLight Laser Prostatectomy with his Clinical Supervisor,
                              get approval from his Clinical Supervisor before performing
                              the procedure, and perform the procedure while observed by
                              the Clinical Supervisor. 
                  
                              Dr. Sorensen's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sorensen, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Sorensen, give my irrevocable consent to anyone who facilitates my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: FSMB
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: April 11, 2019
Summary: Stipulation to Informal Disposition

 

Source: Member
Active Date: October 24, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ronald Bjorndahl Sorensen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 24, 2018.

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sorensen engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of urology. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Sorensen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months.

During Clinical Supervision, Dr. Sorensen will pre-operatively review any cases where he proposes to perform Green Light Laser Prostatectomy with his Clinical Supervisor, get approval from his Clinical Supervisor before performing the procedure, and perform the procedure while observed by the Clinical Supervisor.

Dr. Sorensen’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)