skip to content

Sobiera, Ruthanne Marie

CPSO#: 65094

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )
Dr. S. Zaheer ( CPSO# 95170 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111


Corporation Name: R. Sobiera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Neville ( CPSO# 63791 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2021