skip to content

Shah, Reema

CPSO#: 95767

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building 5th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-521-1155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. B. and S. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shah ( CPSO# 33758 )
Dr. B. Shah ( CPSO# 51623 )
Dr. R. Shah ( CPSO# 95767 )

Business Address:
6 - 1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 794-7979

Business Address:
Suite 206
2780 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 743-3419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REEMA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015