skip to content

Satsangi, Rashmi

CPSO#: 94569

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Agra University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shiv Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saxena ( CPSO# 83243 )
Dr. R. Satsangi ( CPSO# 94569 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
5th Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Suite 202
99 North Field Drive
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P9
Phone Number: (519) 279-1497

Business Address:
KW Healthy Living Centre
1360 Weber Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 893-6060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 01 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2015