skip to content

Pugash, Robyn Anne

CPSO#: 53910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Imaging, MG 189
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2363
Fax: (416) 480-4841 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Pugash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
MG 189 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6197


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBYN ANNE PUGASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985