skip to content

Mitchell, Rachel Hana Berman

CPSO#: 91155

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry, EG-47
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 5328
Fax: 416-480-6818 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. H. B. Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mitchell ( CPSO# 91155 )

Business Address:
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Department of Psychiatry, EG-47
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: 4164806100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:15 Feb 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL HANA BERMAN MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014