skip to content

MacNay, Ramsay Gordon

CPSO#: 67878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ramsay MacNay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. MacNay ( CPSO# 67878 )
Dr. K. Busche ( CPSO# 88593 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3C5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
82 Stinson Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1S2

Business Address:
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMSAY GORDON MACNAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998