skip to content

Lo, Raymond Ching-Tat

CPSO#: 30789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 521-2737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 5212100 Ext. 44667
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lo and Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cheng ( CPSO# 31630 )
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 30789 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
6 - 103 Queen Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2V5
Phone Number: (905) 528-8088

Business Address:
406 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 521-2737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYMOND CHING-TAT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1979