skip to content

Kamatovic, Ralph John

CPSO#: 79557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
224 Garrison Rd
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1M7
Phone: (905) 871-1777
Fax: (905) 871-2777 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

209 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 3J6
Canada
Phone: (289) 362-5333
Fax: (289) 362-5335
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

7481 Oakwood dr.
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Canada
Phone: (289) 477-6011
Fax: 289 477-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Kamatovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )

Business Address:
224 Garrison Road
Suite 6
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 871-1777

Business Address:
7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Phone Number: (289) 477-6011

Business Address:
5 - 209 Glenridge
St Catharines ON  L2T 3J6
Phone Number: (289) 362-5333


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Corporation Name: R. J. Kamatovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )

Business Address:
6 - 224 Garrison Road
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1M7
Phone Number: (905) 871-1777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RALPH JOHN KAMATOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMATOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005