skip to content

ElSugy, Ramadan Elmahdy

CPSO#: 82373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 May 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 606
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 216-4451
Fax: (905) 497-7999 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ramadan ElSugy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2014
Corporation Name: Ramadan ElSugy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. ElSugy ( CPSO# 82373 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Suite 606
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L3R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 216-4451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMADAN ELMAHDY ELSUGY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSUGY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 16 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2009 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011