skip to content

Curtis, Randolph Mason

CPSO#: 105998

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dales Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dales ( CPSO# 97564 )
Dr. R. Curtis ( CPSO# 105998)

Business Address:
208-190 Wortley Rd
London ON  N6C 4Y7

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:15 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RANDOLPH MASON CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020