skip to content

Citren, Robert Michael

CPSO#: 26447

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007
Corporation Name: Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Citren ( CPSO# 26447 )

Business Address:
Burlington Professional Centre
STL Diagnostic Imaging
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 637-6608

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020