skip to content

Aviv, Richard Ivan

CPSO#: 78068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus, CPCR Building
501 Smyth Rd
K1H1M2
Ottawa ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 613 7378899 Ext. 73040 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.I. Aviv Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )

Business Address:
GNMI
10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Suite 100
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Phone Number: (905) 568-3768

Business Address:
KHM 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Suite 101
Markham ON  L3T 7X8


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD IVAN AVIV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVIV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012